SC H3750 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-9-650, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Deer Hunting, So As To Revise The Number Of Antlerless Deer Tags That May Be Issued By The Department Of Natural Resources Under Certain Circumstances; And To Amend Section 50-11-390, Relating To The Department Of Natural Resources' Authority To Regulate The Taking Of Deer, So As To Delete The Provision That Requires The Department To Establish A Minimum Number Of Antlerless Days In The State's Game Zones. - Ratified Title
Title
Deer hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Act No. 19 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date 04/03/19 | |
2019-04-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-03 | Ratified R 29 | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-19 | House | Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Ligon |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |