SC H3754 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Definition Of "homeowners Association"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Time-Sharing Plan Extensions and Termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 66
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 86
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-05-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Goldfinch
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-21HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-02-21HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2019-02-21HouseRead second time
2019-02-21HouseAmended
2019-02-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2730120(n/a)See Bill Text
273210(n/a)See Bill Text
2732410(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3754&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190124.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190221.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190222.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190430.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190501.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3754_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15713
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16665

Bill Comments

feedback