SC H3758 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 51-5)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 15-38-15, 15-38-20, 15-38-40, And 15-38-50, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The Contribution Among Tortfeasors Act, All So As To Include Persons Or Entities Including Defendants And Nonparties For Purposes Of Allocation Of Fault, And To Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Tortfeasors Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam |
2019-04-23 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Clary |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: G.M.Smith |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bailey |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McCoy |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Morgan, Taylor, Elliott |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Atkinson |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0591 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 38 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 38 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 38 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 38 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3758&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3758_20190124.htm |