SC H3785 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Remove The Existing Boilerplate Language Required And Instead Provide Such Disclaimers Must Comply With Certain National Standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accountants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 68
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 88
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-91 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-04-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-03HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2019-04-03HouseRead second time
2019-04-03HouseAmended
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-03-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40210(n/a)See Bill Text
40220(n/a)See Bill Text
402240(n/a)See Bill Text
402340(n/a)See Bill Text
40235(n/a)See Bill Text
40240(n/a)See Bill Text
40280(n/a)See Bill Text
40290(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3785&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190129.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190326.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190403.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190430.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3785_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16249
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16733
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16855

Bill Comments

feedback