SC H3819 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 755 Of 1988, Relating To Abbeville County School District No. 60, So As To Provide That The School District Board Of Trustees Shall Have Total Fiscal Autonomy. - Ratified Title
Title
Abbeville County School District No. 60
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Rep. John West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 105 | |
2019-05-03 | Effective date 05/01/19 | |
2019-05-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Ratified R 41 | |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-27 | House | Recalled from Abbeville Delegation |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Abbeville Delegation |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |