SC H3821 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Include Certifying The Manner Of Death And Executing Do Not Resuscitate Orders Except In Certain Circumstances, And To Permit The Prescribing Of Schedule Ii Narcotic Substances For Patients Residing In Long-term Care Settings In Certain Circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 1 N: 105 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 87
2019-06-10 Effective date 07/23/19
2019-05-24 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 108
2019-05-21HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2019-05-20HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-09HouseConference committee appointed Herbkersman, Clary, Ridgeway
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Davis, Bright-Matthews, Gambrell
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-1 Nays-105
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-04-09SenateCommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-09SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-20HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-19HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-4
2019-03-19HouseRead second time
2019-03-19HouseAmended
2019-03-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0464 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
328325(n/a)See Bill Text
328340(n/a)See Bill Text
403334(n/a)See Bill Text
446374(n/a)See Bill Text
447815(n/a)See Bill Text
447830(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3821&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190131.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190308.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190319.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190426.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3821_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16124
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16659
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16822
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16868
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16873

Bill Comments

feedback