SC H3951 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide These Qualifications Also Apply To Candidates For Sheriff, To Make Technical Changes, To Provide A Sheriff Holding Office On The Effective Date Of This Section Is Not Required To Be An Experienced Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or Be Eligible To Obtain A Class 1 Law Enforcement Officer Certificate Upon The Commencement Of His Term Of Office, And To Provide Additional Qualifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sheriff qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 70
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 90
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-02SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-02SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-04-23SenateRead second time
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-11SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-03HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-9
2019-04-03HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-02HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
2019-04-02HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseAmended
2019-03-28HouseReconsidered
2019-03-27HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-1
2019-03-27HouseRead second time
2019-03-27HouseAmended
2019-03-26HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-27-19
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams
2019-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Thayer, McCravy
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0534 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311110(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3951&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190402.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190411.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190412.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190423.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3951_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16205
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16227
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16246
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16550

Bill Comments

feedback