SC H3973 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Add Female Genital Mutilation Of A Minor To The Definition Of "child Abuse Or Neglect" Or "harm"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female genital mutilation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 71
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 91
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: M.B.Matthews (ch), Shealy, Senn
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
2019-03-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-06HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2019-03-06HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-05HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2019-03-05HouseRead second time
2019-03-05HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Gilliard
2019-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-5-19
2019-02-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63720(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3973&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190213.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190227.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190306.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3973_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15770
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15790
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16653

Bill Comments

feedback