SC H3998 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Act No. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Act No. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "workforce And Senior Affordable Housing Act" By Adding Section 12-6-3795 So As To Allow A Taxpayer Eligible For The Federal Housing Tax Credit To Claim A South Carolina Housing Tax Credit. - Ratified Title
Title
Workforce and Senior Affordable Housing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 97 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Act No. 137 | |
2020-05-19 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2020-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-05-12 | Ratified R 142 | |
2020-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-18 |
2020-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2019-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-22 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons |
2019-04-04 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Rivers, Brown, Jefferson, R.Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0585 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Finance