SC H4001 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriate Monies From The Capital Reserve Fund For Fiscal Year 2018-2019, And To Allow Unexpended Funds Appropriated To Be Carried Forward To Succeeding Fiscal Years And Expended For The Same Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Reserve Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10 Act No. 92
2019-06-10 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2019-05-28 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 111
2019-05-21SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
2019-05-21HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-09SenateConference committee appointed Leatherman, Jackson, Bennett
2019-05-09HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. G.M. Smith, Rutherford, Simrill
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-0 Nays-42
2019-05-08SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-07HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-07HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-02HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-19
2019-04-30HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 5-1-19
2019-04-19SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-04-18SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-04-18SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-04-18SenateRead second time
2019-04-18SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-13HouseRoll call Yeas-94 Nays-1
2019-03-13HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-12HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2019-03-12HouseRead second time
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseSpecial order, set for Immediately after third reading of H. 4000
2019-03-06HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-7-19
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4001&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190312.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190408.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190418.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4001_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16084
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16087
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16531
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16706
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16880
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16890

Bill Comments

feedback