SC H4012 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Alter The Definition Of The Term "division"; To Repeal Section 48-9-40 Relating To The Renaming Of The State Land Resources Conservation Commission; To Repeal Section 48-9-230 Relating To Advisors To The Land Resources And Conservation Districts Division Of The Department Of Natural Resources; To Repeal Article 13 Of Chapter 9, Title 48 Relating To Land Use Regulations; And To Repeal Article 15 Of Chapter 9, Title 48 Relating To The Board Of Adjustment For A Newly Organized Soil And Water Conservation District

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Resources Conservation Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 74
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 94
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-09HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
481110(n/a)See Bill Text
4891220(n/a)See Bill Text
4891250(n/a)See Bill Text
48915(n/a)See Bill Text
489220(n/a)See Bill Text
489230(n/a)See Bill Text
48930(n/a)See Bill Text
489310(n/a)See Bill Text
48940(n/a)See Bill Text
48945(n/a)See Bill Text
48950(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback