SC H4013 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establish New Duties For The Unit And Remove Certain Mapping Duties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Geological Survey Unit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 75
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 95
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-04HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
482210(n/a)See Bill Text
482230(n/a)See Bill Text
482240(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback