SC H4017 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1-30-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Department Of Parks, Recreation And Tourism, So As To Establish Objectives For The South Carolina Film Commission.
Title
Parks, Recreation and Tourism ; establish objectives for SC Film Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] | Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D] |
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D] | Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-3 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis, Gagnon |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |