SC H4019 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 51-7-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Department Of Parks, Recreation And Tourism's Authority To Construct Streets And Roads Through Hunting Island, So As To Remove References To Residential Areas; To Amend Section 51-7-70, Relating To The Payment Of Revenue Obligations, So As To Remove Certain Actions The Department May Undertake To Secure Payment Of Obligations; And To Repeal Section 51-7-20 Relating To Leases Of Residential Areas On Hunting Island.
Title
Parks, Recreation and Tourism authority to construct roads through Hunting Island
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-3 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 7 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 7 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |