SC H4020 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide New Duties For The Department; And To Repeal Article 3 Of Chapter 1, Title 51 Relating To The Division Of Community Development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers and duties; provide new duties for Parks, Recreation and Tourism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 76
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 96
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51160(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback