SC H4047 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-11-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Methods Of Nominating Candidates, So As To Prohibit A Candidate From Filing More Than One Statement Of Intention Of Candidacy For A Single Election, And To Prohibit A Candidate From Being Nominated By More Than One Political Party For A Single Office In An Election; And To Amend Section 7-13-320, Relating To Ballots And Specifications, So As To Prohibit A Candidate's Name From Appearing On The Ballot More Than Once.
Title
Candidate nominations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill, Pope, Chellis |
2019-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant, Burns, Chumley, Trantham |
2019-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Morgan, Wooten, Ligon |
2019-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bailey, Hewitt, Felder, Cogswell, B.Cox, Elliott |
2019-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Forrest, Huggins, Hixon, Hyde, Blackwell, Willis, Taylor |
2019-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile |
2019-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4047&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4047_20190221.htm |