SC H4078 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 2-1-230, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Requirement That Certain Reports Submitted To The General Assembly Must Be Electronically Transmitted, So As To Extend The Requirement To Reports Submitted To A Standing Committee Or Any Other Committee Created By The General Assembly.
Title
Reports submitted to General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Hardee, Hyde, Bailey, Hewitt |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |