SC H4203 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 8-13-1300, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions Applicable To South Carolina Campaign Practices, So As To Revise The Definitions Of "committee", "contribution", "noncandidate Committee", And "ballot Measure Committee".
Title
Campaign practices
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Mandy Norrell [D] | Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] |
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2019-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-04-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell, Funderburk |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4203&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4203_20190307.htm |