SC H4210 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-22-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Duties Of The South Carolina Geological Survey Unit Of The Department Of Natural Resources, So As To Authorize The Division To Conduct Topographic Mapping Using Light Detection And Ranging (lidar) Data Collections To Ensure Compliance With Certain Federal Emergency Management Agency Standards, To Require The Division To Provide This Information To The South Carolina Department Of Natural Resources Flood Mitigation Program, And To Require That The Topographic Maps Be Made Available To The Public On The Department Of Natural Resources' Website.
Title
Geological Survey Unit of DNR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt |
2019-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0690 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4210&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4210_20190307.htm |