SC H4239 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That A Certain Area Is Closed To Trawling From May First Through September Fifteenth And To Remove Language Concerning This Area

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trawling restriction areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 78
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 98
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-03HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-02HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2019-04-02HouseRead second time
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0576 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
505715(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback