SC H4243 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specify Certain Job Development Credit Requirements That Apply To A Professional Sports Team

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional sports team

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 88 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 102 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Recorded Vote, 2nd Reading By Unanimous Consent (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 83
2019-06-10 Effective date 05/22/19
2019-05-22 Signed By Governor
2019-05-21 Ratified R 103
2019-05-20HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-88 Nays-18
2019-05-20HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-20SenateRoll call Ayes-23 Nays-17
2019-05-20SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-09HouseConference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Weeks
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Climer, Harpootlian, Gregory
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-102
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-09SenateRoll call Ayes-27 Nays-15
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-09SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-18SenateRecalled from Committee on Finance
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-26HouseRoll call Yeas-90 Nays-25
2019-03-26HouseRead second time
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales, Gilliard, Blackwell, B.Cox, Anderson
2019-03-21HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-26-19
2019-03-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Calhoon, McKnight, Spires, Elliott, Gilliam, West, Atkinson
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown, W.Cox
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0655 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report: Favorable Finance
S0309 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Weeks

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119805(n/a)See Bill Text
119830(n/a)See Bill Text
1210120(n/a)See Bill Text
1263360(n/a)See Bill Text
4930(n/a)See Bill Text
5320(n/a)See Bill Text
5730(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4243&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190313.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190314.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190422.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4243_20190520.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16164
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16174
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16715
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16779
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16847
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16859
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16865

Bill Comments

feedback