SC H4246 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 127
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 60 Of 2017, Relating To Criminal Background Checks By The Real Estate Commission, So As To Change The Time Effective Date To July 1, 2020, And To Limit Applicability Of This Revised Time Effective Date With Respect To License Renewals. - Ratified Title
Title
Criminal Background checks for real estate professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Act No. 127 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2020-03-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 130 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | House | Amended |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0649 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry