SC H4276 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminate The Gaddy's Mill Precinct And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dillon County Voting Precincts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 80
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 100
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-26HouseRoll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
2019-03-26HouseRead second time
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77220(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback