SC H4380 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Require Tnc Vehicles In This State To Display License Plate Numbers From The Front, To Establish Additional Requirements Regarding The Front-displayed License Plate Numbers, And To Establish Misdemeanor Offenses For Misrepresenting Oneself As An Authorized Tnc Driver And Knowingly Using Tnc Trade Dress Or Tnc Ridesharing Applications In The Furtherance Of Criminal Activity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Samantha L. Josephson Ridesharing Safety Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 82
2019-05-31 Effective date 06/15/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 102
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-1
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2019-04-09HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt, Bailey
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58231640(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4380&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190402.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190402A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190426.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190508A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4380_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16337
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16722

Bill Comments

feedback