SC H4458 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructure The Offenses To Ensure Cigarette Butts And Cigarette Component Litter And Deceased Animals Are Included In The Purview Of The Statute, And To Restructure The Penalties
Title
Littering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 214 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 252 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2018-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-10-18 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-4 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-14 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | House | Amended |
2018-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McEachern, Magnuson, Martin, Bowers |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Hewitt, Crawford, McGinnis, Ott, Bamberg, Erickson, Cobb-Hunter, Willis, Mace, Hill, Gagnon, West, Hardee, Wheeler |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2018-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Yow, Duckworth, Burns, Blackwell, Dillard, Davis |
2018-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3924 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary