SC H4479 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Definitions For Certain Terms, To Provide That A Sheriff Or Chief Of A Law Enforcement Agency Or Department Must Report To The Criminal Justice Academy Certain Misconduct By A Law Enforcement Officer Who Shall Be Notified Of The Allegation Of Misconduct And May Request A Contested Hearing, To Provide For A Proceeding To Adjudicate The Allegation, To Provide For The Employment Of Persons Who Have Allegations Of Misconduct Filed Against Them, And To Provide That Certain Persons Must Keep The Academy Informed Of Their Current Address
Title
Law Enforcement Training Council, hearings, misconduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 215 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 253 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0518 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons