SC H4530 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 329
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 329
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, RELATING TO REGULATIONS FOR SPECIES OR SUBSPECIES OF NON-GAME WILDLIFE, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4069, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE. - ratified title
Title
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Regulations For Species Or Subspecies Of Non-game Wildlife, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4069, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 329 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date 04/01/10 | |
2010-04-01 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 165 | |
2010-03-23 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-5 | |
2010-03-18 | Read second time SJ-10 | |
2010-03-17 | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-15 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-5 | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced and read first time SJ-5 | |
2010-03-03 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-9 | |
2010-03-02 | Read second time HJ-64 | |
2010-02-25 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, March 2, 2010 HJ-56 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-21 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4530&session=118 |