SC H4655 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urge Our Federal, State, And Local Governments, Along With Churches And Neighborhood Associations, To Accelerate Their Efforts To Assist The Homeless In Light Of The Nation's Economy And Adverse Weather Conditions.
Title
Help the homeless in light of the nations economy and weather conditions
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |