SC H4656 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Crawford Road In York County From Its Intersection With Hampton Road To Its Intersection With Heckle Boulevard In York County "brother David Boone Memorial Road" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
York County; Brother David Boone Memorial Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |