SC H4673 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Define "aviation Activities", To Include Aviation Activities Within The Definition Of "recreational Purpose", And To Include Easement Holder Within The Definition Of "owner"
Title
Landowners liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 255 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 303 | |
2014-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-05-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Gregory |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |