SC H4683 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require Dhec To Initiate A New Baseline Cycle By No Sooner Than January 1, 2024, And To Provide Which Baseline And Setback Lines Will Be In Effect For A Landowner Until The New Baseline And Setback Line Are Established
Title
Beachfront Management Reform Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Act No. 173 | |
2018-05-11 | Effective date 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Ratified R 186 | |
2018-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-04-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2018-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Jefferson, Hamilton |
2018-03-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-8-18 |
2018-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2018-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, Atkinson, Bannister |
2018-02-22 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-06-18 |
2018-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley |
2018-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Lucas |
2018-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile, Hixon, Taylor, Arrington, D.C.Moss, Atwater, S.Rivers |
2018-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 1 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 39 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |