SC H4715 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 303
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 303
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO AUTHORIZE THE STATE BUDGET AND CONTROL BOARD TO TRANSFER OWNERSHIP OF JEFFERSON NATIONAL GUARD ARMORY IN JEFFERSON, SOUTH CAROLINA, TO THE COUNTY OF CHESTERFIELD. - ratified title
Title
Authorize The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer Ownership Of Jefferson National Guard Armory In Jefferson, South Carolina, To The County Of Chesterfield. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Vick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 303 | |
2010-07-19 | Effective date 06/29/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Veto overridden Yeas-32 Nays-5 SJ-94 | |
2010-06-15 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-3 Nays-0 HJ-126 | |
2010-06-07 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 283 | |
2010-05-25 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-24 | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time SJ-15 | |
2010-05-19 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-37 | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-16 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and read first time SJ-16 | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-28 | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time HJ-86 | |
2010-04-22 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means HJ-84 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-59 | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced and read first time HJ-59 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4715&session=118 |