SC H4762 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Erect Signs Along The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 63 In Hampton County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 278 To Its Intersection With Brookwood Drive Containing The Words "home Of Dwight Smith #7 Atlanta Braves World Series Champion 1995".
Title
Home of Dwight Smith #7 Atlanta Braves World Series Champion 1995 intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |