SC H4807 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 333
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 333
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION, RELATING TO REQUIREMENTS FOR ADDITIONAL AREAS OF CERTIFICATION, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4117, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE. - ratified title
Title
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To Requirements For Additional Areas Of Certification, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4117, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 333 | |
2010-05-26 | Effective date 05/20/10 | |
2010-05-20 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-05-13 | Ratified R 216 | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-14 | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time SJ-19 | |
2010-05-04 | Recalled from Committee on Education SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-11 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-11 | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-9 | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time HJ-57 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-21 |
Same As/Similar To
S1312 (Similar To) 2010-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-27
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4807&session=118 |