SC H4807 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 227
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Suspension Period And Revise The Date When The Repeal Becomes Effective
Title
Wild turkey seasons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 227 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 269 | |
2018-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |