SC H4820 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Union Boulevard From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 49 To Its Intersection With The Duncan Bypass And Continuing Along Industrial Park Road From Its Intersection With The Duncan Bypass To South Carolina Highway 49 In Union County "reverend Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Highway" In Honor Of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Union County; Reverend Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |