SC H4838 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 338
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 338
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO PROVIDE THAT A LOCAL SCHOOL DISTRICT MAY PAY TEACHERS BASED ON THE YEARS OF EXPERIENCE THE TEACHERS POSSESSED IN FISCAL YEAR 2009-2010 WITHOUT NEGATIVE IMPACT TO THEIR EXPERIENCE CREDIT; TO PROVIDE VOTING AND NOTICE REQUIREMENTS FOR THIS DECISION; TO REQUIRE THAT PAYMENT ACCORDING TO THE 2009-2010 DATA BE APPLIED UNIFORMLY; TO PROVIDE THAT A LOCAL SCHOOL DISTRICT MAY NOT PAY DISTRICT OR SCHOOL ADMINISTRATORS MORE THAN THEY RECEIVED IN FISCAL YEAR 2009-2010; TO REQUIRE A LOCAL SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PAY TEACHERS AND SCHOOL AND DISTRICT ADMINISTRATORS FOR CHANGES IN THEIR EDUCATION LEVEL; AND TO DEFINE CERTAIN TERMS. - ratified title
Title
Provide That A Local School District May Pay Teachers Based On The Years Of Experience The Teachers Possessed In Fiscal Year 2009-2010 Without Negative Impact To Their Experience Credit; To Provide Voting And Notice Requirements For This Decision; To Require That Payment According To The 2009-2010 Data Be Applied Uniformly; To Provide That A Local School District May Not Pay District Or School Administrators More Than They Received In Fiscal Year 2009-2010; To Require A Local School District To Pay Teachers And School And District Administrators For Changes In Their Education Level; And To Define Certain Terms. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 338 | |
2010-06-03 | Effective date 05/28/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Ratified R 247 | |
2010-05-20 | Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-1 HJ-36 | |
2010-05-20 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-36 | |
2010-05-11 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-21 | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time SJ-27 | |
2010-05-06 | Amended SJ-27 | |
2010-05-05 | Committee report: Favorable Education SJ-17 | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-18 | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced and read first time SJ-18 | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-65 | |
2010-04-27 | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-4 HJ-143 | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time HJ-143 | |
2010-04-27 | Requests for debate removed-Rep(s). Sellers, Govan, Hosey, McEachern, Neilson, King, JR Smith, Kennedy, and Ott HJ-67 | |
2010-04-22 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Weeks, Kennedy, Sellers, Hosey, Cooper, Clyburn, Neilson, Jefferson, Ott, Govan, JH Neal, Huggins, White, JR Smith, King, Parks, Gilliard, Ballentine, Bingham, Gambrell, McEachern, and Rice HJ-73 | |
2010-04-22 | Amended HJ-71 | |
2010-04-20 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means HJ-34 | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-17 | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced and read first time HJ-17 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4838&session=118 |