SC H4885 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 334
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 334
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, RELATING TO REGULATIONS OF REAL PROPERTY OWNED AND LEASED BY THE DEPARTMENT, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4110, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE. - ratified title
Title
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Regulations Of Real Property Owned And Leased By The Department, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4110, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 334 | |
2010-05-26 | Effective date 05/20/10 | |
2010-05-20 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-05-13 | Ratified R 217 | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-12 | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time SJ-15 | |
2010-05-05 | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-17 | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-19 | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced and read first time SJ-19 | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-25 | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time HJ-35 | |
2010-04-22 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-6 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4885&session=118 |