SC H4900 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office.
Title
Voting precincts, Berkeley County
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Rivers [R] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. William Crosby [R] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
Rep. Nancy Mace [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Berkeley Delegation |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Berkeley Delegation |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |