SC H4966 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 315
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 315
Summary
AN ACT TO AUTHORIZE THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF KERSHAW COUNTY TO ISSUE GENERAL OBLIGATION BONDS OF THE SCHOOL DISTRICT WITHIN ITS CONSTITUTIONAL DEBT LIMIT, IN ONE OR MORE SERIES, IN A TOTAL AMOUNT NOT TO EXCEED TWO MILLION FIVE HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS, TO DEFRAY THE LOSS OF EDUCATION FINANCE ACT FUNDS TO THE SCHOOL DISTRICT, TO PRESCRIBE THE CONDITIONS UNDER WHICH THE BONDS MAY BE ISSUED AND THE PURPOSES FOR WHICH THE PROCEEDS MAY BE EXPENDED, AND TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE PAYMENT OF THE BONDS. - ratified title
Title
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of The School District Of Kershaw County To Issue General Obligation Bonds Of The School District Within Its Constitutional Debt Limit, In One Or More Series, In A Total Amount Not To Exceed Two Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars, To Defray The Loss Of Education Finance Act Funds To The School District, To Prescribe The Conditions Under Which The Bonds May Be Issued And The Purposes For Which The Proceeds May Be Expended, And To Make Provision For The Payment Of The Bonds. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 315 | |
2010-07-28 | Effective date 06/16/10 | |
2010-06-16 | Veto overridden Yeas-2 Nays-0 SJ-50 | |
2010-06-15 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-2 Nays-0 HJ-134 | |
2010-06-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 336 | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-35 | |
2010-05-27 | Read second time SJ-29 | |
2010-05-18 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-11 | |
2010-05-14 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-1 | |
2010-05-13 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-8 | |
2010-05-13 | Read second time HJ-8 | |
2010-05-12 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-14 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4966&session=118 |