SC H4980 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 05/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 05/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Membership Of Its Governing Commission To Include Additional Members From Spartanburg County, And To Add The "enoree Basin" Of Spartanburg County To Rewa's Service Area
Title
Renewable Water Sources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 273 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Amended |
2018-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Spartanburg Delegation |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |