SC H5112 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 24-13-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Computation Of Time Served By A Prisoner Under A Court-imposed Sentence, So As To Provide A Prisoner May Be Given Full Credit Against A Sentence For Time Spent Under Global Positioning System (gps) Monitoring.
Title
Prisoners; calculation of time served
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20 |
2020-05-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Murphy |
2020-04-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |