SC S0017 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To Amend Section 7-13-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Candidates' Qualifications, So As To Provide That A Candidate For Sheriff And A Candidate For Coroner May Be Certified By A Political Party Or Authority To Which A Petition Is Submitted If The Candidate Submits A Sworn Fully Completed Affidavit; To Amend Section 7-13-350, Relating To Certification Of Candidates, So As To Provide That A Candidate For Sheriff And A Candidate For Coroner May Be Certified By A Political Party Or Authority To Which A Petition Is Submitted If The Candidate Submits A Sworn Fully Completed Affidavit; To Amend Section 7-13-351, Relating To Nominees By Petition, So As To Provide That A Candidate For Sheriff And A Candidate For Coroner May Be Certified By A Political Party Or Authority To Which A Petition Is Submitted If The Candidate Submits A Sworn Fully Completed Affidavit; To Amend Section 17-5-130, Relating To Coroner Qualifications, So As To Provide That A Candidate For Coroner May Be Certified By A Political Party Or Authority To Which A Petition Is Submitted If The Candidate Submits A Sworn Fully Completed Affidavit And, In Addition, To Specify That A Forensic Science Degree Or Certification Program To Be Completed Within One Year Of Being Elected To The Office Of Coroner Must Be Posted On The South Carolina Coroners Association Website And, Before Any Change To The Approved Recognized Forensic Science Degree Or Certification Program Takes Place, The New Recognized Forensic Science Degree Or Certification Program Must Be Approved By The Criminal Justice Academy And Posted On The South Carolina Coroners Association Website; And To Amend Section 23-11-110(b), Relating To The Qualifications That A Sheriff Must Possess, So As To Provide That A Candidate For Sheriff May Be Certified By A Political Party Or Authority To Which A Petition Is Submitted If The Candidate Submits A Sworn Fully Completed Affidavit.
Title
Voter Registration and Election County Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, M.B.Matthews, Gambrell |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 5 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |