SC S0021 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Change The Operation Of The Committee By Assigning Certain Responsibilities To Staff Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, To Provide Funding Contingencies, And For Other Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birth certificates prepared after a paternity determination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 42
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 62
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09SenateReturned to House with amendments
2019-05-09SenateHouse amendment amended
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-08HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-07HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2019-05-07HouseRead second time
2019-05-07HouseAmended
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-24SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-01-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3278 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4331 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
441310(n/a)See Bill Text
4463163(n/a)See Bill Text
631770(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0021&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190123.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190124.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190125.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190501.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/21_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15524
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16636
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16794
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16851

Bill Comments

feedback