SC S0105 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Remove References To "animal Refuge" And Replace It With "rescue Organization"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal cruelty and care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 43
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 63
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-28SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-27SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-1
2019-03-27SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateAmended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-02-28SenateAmended
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-29SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
406930(n/a)See Bill Text
471145(n/a)See Bill Text
471225(n/a)See Bill Text
47310(n/a)See Bill Text
473470(n/a)See Bill Text
473480(n/a)See Bill Text
473490(n/a)See Bill Text
47360(n/a)See Bill Text
5639600(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0105&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190130.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190228.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190328.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/105_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16216
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16760

Bill Comments

feedback