SC S0109 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-79-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The South Carolina Alarm System Business Act, So As To Add A Definition For "electric Fence", To Add And Revise Other Definitions, And To Make Technical Corrections. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Alarm System Business Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Act No. 31 | |
2019-05-17 | Effective date 05/13/19 | |
2019-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Ratified R 44 | |
2019-05-07 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-75 Nays-5 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |