SC S0205 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-36-320, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Duties Of The Alzheimer's Disease And Related Disorders Resource Coordination Center, So As To Provide For An Additional Duty To Facilitate And Coordinate Early Detection Educational Initiatives For Health Care Providers. - Ratified Title
Title
Alzheimer's disease and related disorders resource coordination center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Act No. 20 | |
2019-05-03 | Effective date 04/26/19 | |
2019-04-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Ratified R 32 | |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |