SC S0259 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 62 To Title 48 So As To Establish The South Carolina Office Of Resilience, To Develop, Implement, And Maintain A Statewide Resilience Plan And To Coordinate Statewide Resilience And Disaster Recovery Efforts, To Provide That A Chief Resilience Officer Shall Govern The Office, To Establish The Statewide Resilience Plan Advisory Committee, To Transfer The South Carolina Disaster Recovery Office To The South Carolina Office Of Resilience, And To Create The Disaster Relief And Resilience Reserve Fund To Fund The Statewide Resilience Plan, Disaster Relief Assistance, And Hazard Mitigation And Infrastructure Improvements, To Establish The South Carolina Resilience Revolving Fund To Provide Low Interest Loans To Perform Flooded-home Buyouts And Floodplain Restoration; And To Amend Section 6-29-510, Relating To Comprehensive Plans Of Local Planning Commissions, So As To Require Local Comprehensive Plans To Include A Resilience Element. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Resilience Revolving Fund Act
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Marlon Kimpson [D] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
Sen. Paul Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Nonconcur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Nonconcur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 163 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 09/29/20 | |
2020-09-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 153 | |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference report received and adopted |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Goldfinch, Climer, Sabb |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference committee appointed GM Smith, Crawford, and Stavrinakis |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Goldfinch, Climer, Sabb |
2020-09-23 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. GM Smith, Crawford, and Stavrinakis |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-42 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2020-09-23 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-09-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-65 Nays-35 |
2020-09-22 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2020-09-22 | House | Amended |
2020-09-22 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2020-09-22 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-03-27 | House | Committed to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-27 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3083 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell