SC S0281 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allow Landlords To Ask Certain Questions Regarding A Tenant's Or Prospective Tenant's Animal For Purposes Of Reasonable Accommodations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guide dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 44
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 64
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-04-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-04-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-10SenateAmended
2019-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-03SenateRead second time
2019-04-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3459 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
312170(n/a)See Bill Text
473920(n/a)See Bill Text
473970(n/a)See Bill Text
473980(n/a)See Bill Text
473990(n/a)See Bill Text
56710(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0281&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190402.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190403.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190410A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190411.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/281_20190503.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16368
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16758

Bill Comments

feedback