SC S0397 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 61-6-4510 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Municipal Police Officers, To Provide That A County Sheriff Has The Same Power As A Municipal Police Officer To Enforce The Provisions Of Article 13, Chapter 6, Title 61.
Title
Allows county sheriffs the authority to enforce alcohol violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Hutto, Talley, Cash, Harpootlian |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary